WELSH CENTRE FOR ACTION ON DEPENDENCY AND ADDICTION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides a holistic, person centred service for individuals of all ages affected by alcohol, drugs or other substances, including those in the criminal justice system, with the ultimate aim of improving lives and nurturing potential. The charity also provides education and training on substance misuse and related topics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bridgend
- Cardiff
- City Of Swansea
- Monmouthshire
- Neath Port Talbot
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 25 July 2001: Standard registration
- WCADA LTD (Working name)
- WEST GLAMORGAN COUNCIL ON ALCOHOL AND DRUG ABUSE LIMITED (Previous name)
- WGCADA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dyfrig ap Dafydd | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Simon Paul Green | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Clive Wolfendale | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Howard Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60m | £2.41m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75m | £2.80m | £979.92k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.23m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.49m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £969 | £3.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.80k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.60m | £2.40m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £826 | £292 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £3.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £969 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.74m | £2.79m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.31k | £287 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £67.97k | £39.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/04/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 29/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
TO REDUCE, TREAT AND PREVENT THE HARM CAUSED BY DEPENDENCY AND ADDICTION TO INDIVIDUALS, THEIR FAMILIES AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY INCLUDING INTERVENTIONS TO REDUCE HARM IN THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SYSTEM, TOGETHER WITH ALL INCIDENTAL SERVICES RELATING THERETO WITHIN THE AREA OF WALES.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE AREA OF WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Adferiad Recovery Ltd
Ty Dafydd Alun
36 Princes Drive
Colwyn Bay
Conwy
LL29 8LA
- Phone:
- 01492863000
- Email:
- info@adferiad.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window