ICHS DEVELOPMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 1089574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The company's objectives are to advance the education of the pupils of Ilford County High School by providing or assisting in the provision of amenities, facilities, equipment or services not financed by the Local Education Authority or elsewhere.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £11,571
Total expenditure: £15,411

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Redbridge

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Melvin Pedro Trustee 18 July 2018
SUKKAT SHALOM REFORM SYNAGOGUE
Received: On time
THE MOVEMENT FOR REFORM JUDAISM
Received: On time
Kalbinder Benning Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
Senthooran Ramachandran Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
Raymond Vincent Ernest Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record
REBECCA DRYSDALE Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.85k £10.93k £16.52k £13.89k £11.57k
Total expenditure £49.06k £17.16k £17.06k £15.39k £15.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ILFORD COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL
FREMANTLE ROAD
ILFORD
IG6 2JB
Phone:
02085516496