Financial history CMZ LTD

Charity number: 1087870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.94m £2.82m £3.84m £3.63m £3.84m
Total expenditure £3.78m £2.82m £3.84m £3.80m £3.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.94m £2.82m £3.84m £3.63m £3.84m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.78m £2.82m £3.84m £3.80m £3.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.07k £8.45k £12.49k £9.72k £6.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.32m £2.63m £3.66m £3.54m £3.48m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0