Trustees THE BATH HOUSE CHILDREN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity Number: 1089829

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bianca Antonia Bibart | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Wootliff | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Mylius | Trustee | 04 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beatrice Marion Collier | Trustee | 03 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mary Norwood | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.