ANSEBA DEVELOPMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Anseba Development is a non-profit charitable organisation that exists to enable and support the people of the Anseba Zone in the State of Eritrea by providing practical assistance to individuals, projects and organisations in the region. It also raises public awareness about the acute needs of the people in the region Please also visit www.anseba-development.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Eritrea
Governance
- 04 October 2002: Standard registration
- 27 March 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £787 | £568 | £508 | £484 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.97k | £12 | £72 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 30 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 22 February 2015 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 05 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18TH MAY 2001
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE POVERTY PARTICULARLY AMONG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ANSABA ZONE OF ERITREA BY PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, GRANTS AND SUPPORT IN THE AREA OF WELFARE, HEALTH HOUSING, EMPLOYMENT, AGRICULTURE AND IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY AMONG PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ANSABA ZONE OF ERITREA BY PROVIDING/PROMOTING TRAINING PROJECTS, EQUIPMENT, GRANTS AND IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
ERITREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window