Accounts and annual returns GREAT STEEPING PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1087962
Charity reporting is up to date (136 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 November 2024 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 06 December 2023 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 December 2023 524 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 24 March 2022 267 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required