Financial history ROCHDALE CHILDREN'S MOORLAND HOME

Charity Number: 1086973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £82.20k £64.07k £72.20k £83.60k £71.38k
Total expenditure £222.95k £65.15k £138.76k £100.15k £77.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A