BUNNY BURROWS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small animal rescue and welfare Educating the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Louise Edwards | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Keenan | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN DAVID CLARKE | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HULDA ERICSSEN SUTTIE | Trustee | 05 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY ANNE SIMPSON | Trustee | 25 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Butler | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.32k | £34.16k | £37.37k | £36.41k | £46.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.37k | £32.97k | £38.32k | £39.47k | £40.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27 NOVEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF RABBITS AND SMALL ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING SUITABLE ACCOMMODATION FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED RABBITS AND SMALL ANIMALS UNTIL THEY ARE RE-HOUSED. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CARE AND OWNERSHIP OF RABBITS AND SMALL ANIMALS. 3) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF STRAY AND UNWANTED RABBITS AND SMALL ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND TO PROVIDE VETERINARY TREATMENT AND NEUTER ALL RABBITS OVER THE AGE OF MONTHS BEFORE THEY ARE REHOMED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 WHITEFIELDS DRIVE
RICHMOND
DL10 7DL
- Phone:
- 01748824788
- Email:
- gwenbigbunny@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window