THE SOCIETY FOR IRISH CHURCH MISSIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of Irish Church Missions is to evangelize all the peoples of Ireland. Our work in the Republic of Ireland is based in Dublin and is essentially to teach people how to teach the Bible; training students to listen and respond to God's Word properly. In addition the Charity seeks to plant new Churches and spread the gospel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £7,581 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 18 January 2007: Standard registration
- ICM (Working name)
- IRISH CHURCH MISSIONS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER WRAY | Chair | 31 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Andre McClean | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ross Neill | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edmond Coulter | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Smith | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Donohoe | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Jones | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
RT REV WALLACE BENN | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev RICHARD ESPIN-BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £671.70k | £546.97k | £560.30k | £397.55k | £321.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £570.16k | £523.07k | £988.20k | £434.58k | £500.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £7.58k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £573.88k | £538.90k | £549.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £425 | £1.43k | £1.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.84k | £5.74k | £9.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £93.56k | £899 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £114.16k | £0 | £3.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £560.37k | £513.41k | £574.15k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.79k | £9.65k | £10.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £28.71k | £30.45k | £34.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £42.78k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £9.79k | £9.65k | £10.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £403.81k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/10/1925 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/03/2013 as amended on 09 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE GLORY OF GOD BY ADVANCING HIS KINGDOM AMONG IRISH PEOPLE, (WITH SPECIAL CONCERN FOR ROMAN CATHOLICS) BY SPREADING THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AS REVEALED IN THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AND AS EXPRESSED IN THE KEEPING OF THE PRINCIPLES OF THE REFORMATION AS EXPRESSED IN THE ARTICLES OF RELIGION OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE CHURCH OF IRELAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 18 January 2007 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Bachelors Walk
Dublin
- Phone:
- +353 (0)1 873 0829
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window