Trustees THE SOCIETY FOR IRISH CHURCH MISSIONS
Charity number: 1089081

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER WRAY | Chair | 31 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Andre McClean | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ross Neill | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edmond Coulter | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Smith | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Simon Donohoe | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Jones | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
RT REV WALLACE BENN | Trustee | 13 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev RICHARD ESPIN-BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.