Accounts and annual returns THE BATT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1087604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 05 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required