BAGGATOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Baggator, founded 1999, offers a safe, friendly environment for its diverse local community. Collaborating with the community, it runs innovative programmes including Health, Arts, ICT, Cultural Exchanges, and STEM Projects. Where appropriate it supports local groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 25 July 2001: Standard registration
- 31 May 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 20 September 2019: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Phelps | Chair | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Parmer | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Smith | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.66k | £45.85k | £35.02k | £9.07k | £9.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.47k | £41.50k | £54.17k | £9.07k | £9.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.97k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 March 2025 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 March 2025 | 418 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH CREATIVE PROGRAMMES OF INFORMAL EDUCATION, SKILLS TRAINING AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES BUILT IN PARTNERSHIP WITH, AND DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THE LIFE AND PRACTICAL SKILLS OF YOUNG PEOPLE DISADVANTAGED BY THEIR SOCIAL OR FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES AND WHO MAY EXPERIENCE DIFFICULTY SUSTAINING MAINSTREAM EDUCATION PROVISION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRISTOL CITY COUNCIL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Baggator
c/o Raw Space
111 Gloucester Road
Bristol
BS7 8AT
- Phone:
- 07851 686182
- Email:
- Office@baggator.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window