GOSPORT VOLUNTARY ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gosport Voluntary Action (GVA) is the council of Voluntary Services for the Gosport district. It is an independant voluntary organisation supporting the development of the voluntary and community sector locally. GVA also provides a range of services directly to local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £48,495 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 26 June 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr I Reeves | Chair | 03 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Suzanne Ruth Pepper | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Irene Julia Golding | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £363.20k | £533.75k | £407.02k | £399.14k | £380.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £400.88k | £514.37k | £440.56k | £483.27k | £426.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £108.59k | £240.52k | £204.80k | £187.27k | £48.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £125.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £1.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £407.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £112 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £514.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £8.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2001. AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 SEP 2023
Charitable objects
A.TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, IN THE AREA OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE AUTHORITIES COMPRISING THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF HAMPSHIRE (INCLUDING PORTSMOUTH AND SOUTHAMPTON) AND, IN PARTICULAR THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT AND BOROUGH OF GOSPORT (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE “AREA OF BENEFIT”) AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS. B.TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL, REPRESENTATIVES OF THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF GOSPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Martin Snape House
96 Pavilion Way
Gosport
Hampshire
PO12 1FG
- Phone:
- 02392583836
- Email:
- ian.reeves@gva.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window