Financial history BRISTOL ROVERS COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity Number: 1088148
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £418.72k £361.50k £464.33k £631.84k £564.69k
Total expenditure £433.45k £385.17k £428.13k £565.49k £613.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £32.79k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £143.69k £73.82k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £488.16k £490.87k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £499.73k £564.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £65.76k £48.90k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £119.73k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0