Financial history FRIENDS OF BLUEBELL PARK

Charity number: 1089615
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.79k £3.78k £22.69k £21.44k £29.10k
Total expenditure £19.65k £2.14k £23.27k £2.12k £25.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A