FUN HOUSE CARE CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
After School Club for School children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 05 July 2001: Standard registration
- 13 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.72k | £3.89k | £2.58k | £3.20k | £8 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.87k | £2.49k | £564 | £8.07k | £9.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6TH NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND ANY OTHER PERIODS THAT FHCC OPERATES. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS WHO PROVIDE SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATION FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window