Accounts and annual returns BRIDGEND AREA FURNITURE RECYCLING PROJECT

Charity number: 1089975
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 11 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2006 26 July 2007 238 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not submitted