Accounts and annual returns THE ASTOR COLLEGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1088689
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2022 23 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 22 July 2022 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 22 July 2022 722 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required