THE ASTOR COLLEGE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING HELP TO YOUNG CHILDREN WITHIN THE DOVER AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 01 October 2001: Standard registration
- 27 October 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE ASTOR SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £10 | £13 | £2 | £8 | |
|
Total expenditure | £25 | £16 | £16 | £8 | £36 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 July 2022 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2022 | 722 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 20 SEPTEMBER, 2001.
Charitable objects
PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF STUDENTS AT ASTOR SCHOOL TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF ADDITIONAL FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND RECREATION IN AUGMENTATION OF FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
DOVER, KENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window