Financial history DARUL-ARQAM EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1092608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £281.17k £271.08k £367.77k £534.96k £739.72k
Total expenditure £331.04k £243.82k £358.17k £427.59k £446.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £612.96k £726.72k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £427.59k £446.25k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0