CHEVELEY EVERGREEN CLUB

Charity Number: 1087261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We meet every fortnight for a wide range of activities including talks, quizzes, trips and an Autumn outing. These create a sense of companionship - as one of the members said - "it's things like the club that keep me alive". The members range in age from 60 to 90

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024

Total income: £1,991
Total expenditure: £2,036

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 June 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Foreman Trustee 14 August 2024
None on record
ANITA SWANN Trustee 20 May 2015
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN SYMONS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/03/2020 26/03/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £2.30k £0 £692 £1.36k £1.99k
Total expenditure £2.33k £0 £1.05k £1.68k £2.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2023 21 May 2024 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 26 March 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 26 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
129 HIGH STREET
CHEVELEY
NEWMARKET
CB8 9DG
Phone:
01638731700
Website:

No information available