MEDIQUIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money through raffles, coffee mornings, table top sales and donations from local people. The money raised is used to provide medical equipment which is not provided by the NHS and which cannot be purchased by an individual.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 28 August 2001: Standard registration
- 14 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | 31/01/2005 | 31/01/2006 | 31/01/2007 | 31/01/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.60k | £3.68k | £146.97k | £7.82k | £1.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £850 | £4.73k | £5.82k | £2.32k | £301 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 17 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | 06 October 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | 10 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | 29 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | 02 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | 23 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | 13 September 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 FEBRUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF LINCOLNSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, WHICH IS NOT PROVIDED BY THE NHS AND WHICH CANNOT BE PURCHASED BY AN INDIVIDUAL. ALSO TO PROVIDE OTHER ASSOCIATED NEEDS IN THE INTEREST OF PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE, SUCH AS DISTRESS AND SICKNESS FOR THE SAID COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LINCOLNSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window