Financial history YOUTH LEAGUE (UK) LTD

Charity number: 1091146
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £141.05k £310.59k £200.03k £239.87k £284.39k
Total expenditure £109.42k £214.16k £258.98k £230.57k £281.58k
Income from government contracts N/A £32.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.49k N/A £28.63k £10.00k £22.50k