COMMONSIDE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Commonside Trust works with local people in East Mitcham to address poverty and worklessness by running projects promoting good health, learning, entrepreneurship, creativity, good citizenship and sustainable development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £271,632 from 11 government grant(s)
People

17 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Merton
Governance
- 30 November 2001: Standard registration
- COMMONSIDE CDT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mireille Yando-Gelezi | Chair | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dionne McDowell | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dean Willis | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ayodeji Ayorinde | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Samantha Malin | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariah Attakpah | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Syed Murtaza Hussain | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEAN WISBEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £625.00k | £458.27k | £379.68k | £827.84k | £644.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £503.47k | £431.78k | £503.34k | £803.22k | £658.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £343.44k | £117.17k | £54.10k | £381.76k | £271.63k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £51.55k | N/A | N/A | £35.15k | £1.19k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £187.56k | N/A | N/A | £8.38k | £187.46k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £41.70k | N/A | N/A | £780.21k | £19.39k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £249 | N/A | N/A | £232 | £34 | |
|
Income - Other | £343.94k | N/A | N/A | £3.87k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £502.21k | N/A | N/A | £803.22k | £617.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.26k | N/A | N/A | £0 | £40.77k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | £1.78k | £131.11k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £363 | N/A | N/A | £152 | £3.66k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £189.66k | N/A | N/A | £104.47k | £128.29k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.30k | N/A | N/A | £1.44k | £42.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 February 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29TH MARCH 2001
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN REGENERATION AND COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING AND OF ACTIVITIES BRINGING DIRECT COMMUNITY BENEFITS IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON, WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE POLLARDS HILL, LONGTHORNTON AND FIGGES MARSH WARDS IN MITCHAM BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (2) DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF LOCAL DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES (BOTH GEOGRAPHICAL COMMUNITIES AND COMMUNITIES OF INTEREST) IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE (4) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (1) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (11) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES (5) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS (6) WORKING WITH PROVIDERS OF SOCIAL HOUSING TO FACILITATE THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING INTHE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING (7) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES (8) TH PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE (9) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES (10) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT (11) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE (12) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME (13) UNDERTAKING SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS ARE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON, AND PARTICULARLY IN THE POLLARDS HILL, LONGTHORNTON AND FIGGES MARSH WARDS.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON, AND PARTICULARLY IN THE POLLARDS HILL, LONGTHORNTON AND FIGGES MARSH WARDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMONSIDE CDT
SOUTH LODGE AVE
POLLARDS HILL
MITCHAM
CR4 1LT
- Phone:
- 07914318668
- Email:
- info@commonside.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window