SOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
free homeopathy for people who attend various organisations in and aroun swansea, including womens aid, drugs project, mental health centres, homeless shelters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 16 November 2001: Standard registration
- 16 March 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2013 | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £4.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED 13 NOVEMBER 2001 AND 8 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG POOR, DISADVANTAGED AND SOCIALLY EXCLUDED PEOPLE IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SWANSEA BY THE PROVISION OF HOMEOPATHIC HEALTH CARE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH BEHAVIOURAL PROBLEMS AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, PSYCHOTHERAPY AND HOMEOPATHY.
Area of benefit
SWANSEA AND UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window