THE LEADERSHIP AND ETHICS CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Director has on behalf on the Trust been involved in advising and the setting of ethical policies, speaking engagements, lecturing and research, conference work both home and overseas and the writing of papers and books. After publishing the Trust's first book on Christian Ethics, the Trustees are considering the future of the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 March 2002: Standard registration
- 09 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2011 | 31/05/2012 | 31/05/2013 | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £214 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | 18 May 2016 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | 05 August 2015 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2013 | 12 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 MARCH 2002
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO PROMOTE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENTS BY ENCOURAGING THE APPLICATION OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES TO LEADERSHIP WITHIN BUSINESS, THE PROFESSIONS AND PUBLIC LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE EIRE AND USA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window