Financial history COURTHOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1091604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.51k £5.31k £435 £3.17k £26.32k
Total expenditure £16.98k £4.79k £1.76k £1.78k £2.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A