AYLESBURY VALE CHILD CONTACT CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a centre and facilities for children in Aylesbury Vale and surrounding areas to enjoy the company of their non-resident parent or other close family members after the break up of marriage and family. Support is given to relieve the distress of children in this painful and bewildering situation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 23 April 2002: Standard registration
- AYLESBURY CHILD CONTACT CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Veronica Catherine Corben | Chair | 02 April 2014 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA STARR | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Kay Rosemary Morton | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Eldred | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN CLARE EYTON | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|||||
PAULINE NOBLE | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATHY LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82k | £13.02k | £8.06k | £5.78k | £7.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.21k | £6.85k | £6.97k | £9.24k | £8.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED ON 21ST MARCH 2002. AS AMENDED ON 25/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: 1. TO RELIEVE THE HARDSHIP AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN AYLESBURY VALE AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT), CAUSED BY THE BREAK UP OF MARRIAGE, RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A CENTRE AND FACILITIES WHEREBY SUCH CHILDREN CAN MORE READILY ENJOY THE COMPANY AND LOVE OF THEIR NON-RESIDENTIAL PARENT OR OTHER CLOSE FAMILY MEMBERS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH CHILDREN PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO INTERACT WITH THEIR PARENTS AND/OR OTHER FAMILY MEMBERS..
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Fairmeadow
Winslow
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 3JB
- Phone:
- 01296712460
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window