THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS, TURVEY, BEDFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation, repair, maintenance and restoration of the fabric of the parish church of All Saints Turvey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 18 July 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jacqueline Elaine Curtis | Trustee | 10 January 2017 |
|
|||||
KATY KNOWLES | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MARSHALL | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|||||
DANIEL THOMAS CECIL HANBURY | Trustee | 09 November 2000 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.31k | £2.03k | £1.56k | £1.71k | £108 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.12k | £0 | £0 | £33.50k | £375 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 May 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 9TH NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL STAND POSSESSED OF THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND OF ALL CONTRIBUTIONS AND SUBSCRIPTIONS FROM TIME TO TIME RECEIVED BY THEM FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY AS HEREINAFTER MENTIONED UPON TRUST TO APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE APPLIED THE SAME AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AND UPON SUCH TERMS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE FOR THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR , MAINTENANCE, RESTORATION, IMPROVEMENT AND ORNAMENTATION OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS, TURVEY AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
121 High Street
OLNEY
MK46 4EF
- Phone:
- 01234713726
- Email:
- revjo44@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window