Trustees STRATFORD RENAL UNIT TRUST
Charity Number: 1094103
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Charman | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Graham Thomas Watson | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Smith | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Stuart Elliott | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Jane Turney | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Burton | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Margaret Wheeler | Trustee | 09 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
GERALD WHEELER | Trustee | 09 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE WATSON | Trustee | 23 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
MERCY TURNEY | Trustee | 31 August 2004 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA CASSIDY | Trustee | 31 August 2004 |
|
|
||||
TONY BIRD OBE | Trustee | 02 September 2002 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.