ARYA VYSYA ASSOCIATION OF EUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranging trips to attend Hindu temples to celebrate the Hindu religion. Provision of meeting places where prayer sessions can be held. Advancement of the religion for the public benefit. Maintaining a suitable library for the study of the Hindu religion. Arranging annual Vasavi Jayanthi festivals in Birmingham Balaji temple. Arranging some festivals in India and religious congregations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of London
- City Of Wakefield
- Durham
- Leeds City
- Middlesbrough
- India
- United States
Governance
- 10 October 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR RAMAKRISHNAGUPTA MUDALAGIRI DASAPPAGUPTA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RAVI TALLAM | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/09/2019 | 06/09/2020 | 06/09/2021 | 06/09/2022 | 06/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70 | £640 | £465 | £1.44k | £160 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £60 | £43 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2022 | 07 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2021 | 07 March 2023 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 September 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEPTEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE HINDU RELIGION IN PARTICULAR ARYA VYSYA BELIEF. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS, SPIRITUAL, CULTURAL AND EDUCAGTIONAL ACTIVITIES. B) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HINDU RELIGION IN PARTICULAR ARYA VYSYA BELIEFS, TRADITIONS AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 BARNARD WYND
PETERLEE
SR8 1LT
- Phone:
- 01915870561
- Email:
- mdrgupta@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window