Financial history FRIENDS OF CARLTON COURT HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1088894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2019 01/10/2020 01/10/2021 01/10/2022 01/10/2023
Total gross income £1.01k £350 £1.55k £374 £1.84k
Total expenditure £2.51k £2.51k £2.70k £2.27k £2.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A