NORTH WESTERN ASSOCIATION OF THE WELSH PONY AND COB SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the welsh pony and cob and their part breds. To organise breed shows. To support the welfare of welsh ponies and cobs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hughie Murphy | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Wilson | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Hargraves | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.36k | £304 | £3.28k | £7.82k | £7.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.48k | £1.51k | £2.55k | £6.39k | £7.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 November 2023 | 465 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
A. TO ENCOURAGE THE BREEDING AND IMPROVEMENT OF HORSES AND PONIES, MORE ESPECIALLY THOSE OF THE WELSH BREED. B. TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE VARIOUS ARTS AND SCIENCES CONNECTED WITH THE USE AND MANAGEMENT OF HORSES AND PONIES IN GENERAL AND OF THE WELSH MOUNTAIN PONY, THE WELSH PONY, THE WELSH PONY (COB TYPE) AND THE WELSH COB. C. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, THROUGH THE USE OF HORSES AND PONIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Acton Cliff Farm
Cliff Lane
Acton Bridge
NORTHWICH
Cheshire
CW8 2RZ
- Phone:
- 07919380114
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window