ST WILLIAM OF YORK SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1087453
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Holding summer and xmas fair events, tea afternoons, quiz night, race night and ladies night.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £12,812
Total expenditure: £9,115

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lewisham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 July 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SWOYSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JULIE O'KEEFFE Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Sam Darcy Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Joanna Rachtan Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Temitope Medupin Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Louise Parker Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
Mary-Kate Newman Trustee 17 September 2020
None on record
GAIL LOHAN Trustee 18 September 2018
None on record
Christian Moody Trustee 05 October 2017
None on record
SHARON LYNCH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £25.68k £14.63k £18.88k £10.50k £12.81k
Total expenditure £20.28k £22.62k £13.03k £17.01k £9.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. WILLIAM OF YORK SCHOOL
BROCKLEY PARK
LONDON
SE23 1PS
Phone:
020 8690 2842
Website:

No information available