Financial history THE BOR FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1088330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.47k £3.48k £3.57k £3.60k £5.09k
Total expenditure £3.17k £1.17k £150 £197 £188
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A