GOOD NEIGHBOURS IN NORTH CARDIFF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help residents in our community of Cardiff North who have particular need. They may be lonely or older people and have limited mobility, or may need a helping hand and friendly support. Our volunteers provide three main services of transport, shopping and companionship in person or by phone. My Community, Your Community, Our community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
61 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 30 October 2001: Standard registration
- LLANISHEN GOOD NEIGHBOURS (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Mathews | Chair | 21 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Margaret Stockdale | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Smedley | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sebastien Vanoni | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Patterson | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Rayer | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Gibbons | Trustee | 24 February 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.67k | £19.14k | £12.22k | £32.04k | £19.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.85k | £19.36k | £18.00k | £20.86k | £23.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 1981, AS AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 2001. AS AMENDED 5 JUNE 2006. as amended on 22 Jun 2022 as amended on 21 Jun 2023 as amended on 23 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN THE LLANISHEN, THORNHILL, LISVANE, HEATH, LAKESIDE, ROATH PARK AND CYNCOED AREAS OF CARDIFF WHO ARE ELDERLY, DISABLED OR INFIRM OR WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEEDS. (B) TO LIAISE WITH STATUTORY, VOLUNTARY AND PRIVATE BODIES IN PURSUANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVE.
Area of benefit
IN THE LLANISHEN, THORNHILL, LISVANE, HEATH, LAKESIDE, ROATH PARK AND CYNCOED AREAS OF CARDIFF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llanishen Good Neighbours
4 Heol Hir
Llanishen
Cardiff
CF14 5AE
- Phone:
- 02920750751
- Email:
- support@gninc.org.uk
- Website:
-
gninc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window