RUDDINGTON FRAMEWORK KNITTERS MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Framework Knitters museum operates as working museum in the original nineteenth century buildings with handframes & circular machines, holds a knitting collection and specialist library, maintains knitting & framesmithing skills and provides training, in order to advance the education of the public by recording & preserving, interpreting & presenting to the general public the buildings, machin
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,851 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 2001: Standard registration
- RUDDINGTON FRAMEWORK KNITTERS MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Rowson | Chair | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebekah Ellen Pickering-Wood | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Shuttleworth | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryn Smith | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER FREDERICK MCGOWAN | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.37k | £224.08k | £337.54k | £241.92k | £128.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.77k | £206.05k | £434.81k | £191.87k | £179.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.49k | £160.89k | £9.64k | £16.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 February 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 March 2021 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY RECORDING AND PRESERVING, INTERPRETING AND PRESENTING TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC THE BUILDINGS, MACHINERY, SKILLS, LIVING CONDITIONS, HISTORY AND INFLUENCE OF THE FRAMEWORK KNITTERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
RUDDINGTON FRAMEWORK KNITTERS MUSEU
3-7 CHAPEL STREET
RUDDINGTON
NOTTINGHAM
NG11 6HE
- Phone:
- 01159141161
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window