THE KING GEORGE V PLAYING FIELD, ETWALL

Charity number: 1087534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides a playing field/open space for the benefit of all.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KING GEORGE'S FIELD- ETWALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Valerie Hobson Trustee 07 October 2019
None on record
Anne Muller Trustee 09 April 2018
None on record
Andrew Kirke Trustee 05 September 2016
None on record
David Neal Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
NORMAN BERNARD IRELAND Trustee
ETWALL WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
SIR JOHN PORT AND JOHN OSBOURNE ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
BARRIE JAMES PAYTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1 £0 £1 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 December 2024 307 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 The Cottages
Bakers Lane
Doveridge
ASHBOURNE
Derbyshire
DE6 5LA
Phone:
07976230669