HAVERING ASSOCIATION OF VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS LIMITED HAVCO)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Havco was formed to assist the work of voluntary and community organisations in the London Borough of Havering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £105,190 from government contract(s) and £56,272 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Havering
Governance
- 30 August 2001: Standard registration
- 22 September 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HAVCO (Working name)
- HAVERING ASSOCIATION OF VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS (HAVCO) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £894.26k | £561.62k | £538.50k | £427.71k | £210.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £782.95k | £712.93k | £705.56k | £545.23k | £402.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £198.44k | £105.19k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £112.54k | £56.27k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £886.22k | £556.57k | £536.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £8.04k | £5.05k | £2.40k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £774.58k | £703.61k | £696.44k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.37k | £9.32k | £9.12k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 10 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
10 October 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 23 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 28 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 26 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 10 October 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/10/2012
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. (2) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (3)FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS ARTICLE 4: (A)“THIRD SECTOR” MEANS CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES. (B)“CHARITIES” ARE ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. (C)“VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES” ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window