Financial history KING GEORGE'S FIELD, HITCHIN

Charity number: 1087603
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.98k £0 £0 £28.81k £29.87k
Total expenditure £77.01k £37.37k £67.85k £34.05k £34.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A