Accounts and annual returns THE SANDLINGS RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION T/A THE SANBUNKER

Charity number: 1089424
Charity reporting is overdue by 1775 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 February 2025 965 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1775 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1775 days