ST MARK'S HOSPITAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To facilitate research and education into disorders of the gastrointestinal tract and pelvic floor
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Thomas Richard Troubridge Bt | Chair | 08 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Catherine Haumesser | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO AND EDUCATION IN DISORDERS OF THE GASTRO-INTESTINAL TRACT AND PELVIC FLOOR, INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE CAUSES OF AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DISORDERS AND THE CARE OF THOSE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SUCH DISORDERS, AT ANY HOSPITAL OR ACADEMIC INSTITUTION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) ST. MARK'S ACADEMIC INSTITUTE AT ST. MARK'S HOSPITAL NORTHWICK PARK WATFORD ROAD HARROW MIDDLESEX HAI 3UJ.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mark's Hospital Foundation
St Mark's Hospital
Central Middlesex Acton Lane
London
NW10 7NS
- Phone:
- 02084532346
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window