Bellingdon and Asheridge Community Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To improve the conditions of life of the inhabitants of the area of benefit without distinction of political, religious or other opinions by the provision of: (a) a village hall for use by the inhabitants, including use for (i) meetings, lectures and classes (ii) other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation (iii) a recreation ground for use by inhabitants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 12 July 2001: Standard registration
- BAACA (Working name)
- B&ACA (Previous name)
- Bellingdon and Asheridge Community Association (Previous name)
- BELLINGDON AND ASHERIDGE VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALFONZO SAMUEL CAMPBELL FIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Muggeridge-Breene Mr | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Fiddes | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Harding | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Neil Woodley | Trustee | 26 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
HUGH GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.60k | £51.62k | £21.73k | £26.97k | £27.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.02k | £18.43k | £20.28k | £42.11k | £23.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £42.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23RD MAY 2001 as amended on 26 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
1) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF: A) A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS INCLUDING USE FOR: 1) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND 2) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; AND B) A RECREATION GROUND FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS 2) IF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY IS NO LONGER REQUIRED FOR THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL OR RECREATION GROUND FOR THE AREA OF BENEFIT, THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY WILL BE THE PROMOTION OF GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
VILLAGES OF BELLINGDON AND ASHERIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pump Barn
Bellingdon
CHESHAM
Buckinghamshire
HP5 2XU
- Phone:
- 07901824700
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window