FRIENDS OF SPALDWICK SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Spaldwick School, as the PTA for Spaldwick Primary School, undertake fundraising activities to be able to support learning activities through the contribution of funds for additional resources to enhance both the indoor and outdoor educational experiences of the children at the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 09 August 2001: Standard registration
- FOSS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenna Moore | Chair | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Herriman | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Alice Hinchliffe | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Ann Worrell | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steve Nicholls | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.80k | £3.64k | £2.95k | £5.71k | £7.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.99k | £8.01k | £1.75k | £2.32k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND WELFARE OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SPALDWICK COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spaldwick Primary School
Royston Avenue
Spaldwick
HUNTINGDON
PE28 0TH
- Phone:
- 01480 890371
- Email:
- foss@sps.acesmat.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window