SHREE HINDU SAMAJ MANDAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide daily religious services and religious education for the young generation by involving them in activities of the Temple.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Walsall
Governance
- 23 July 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARVIND G PATEL | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
VIJAY PATEL | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DINESH PATEL | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAYANTI PATEL | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Vinesh Parekh | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.66k | £28.33k | £41.07k | £20.64k | £25.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.29k | £19.51k | £16.96k | £38.55k | £56.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.45k | £3.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOVEMBER 1996 AMENDED 20 JANUARY 2002 FURTHER AMENDED 21 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
I)TO PROMOTE THE HINDU RELIGION AND PROVIDE A PLACE OF WORSHIP. II) TO PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN HINDU RELIGION AND CULTURE. III) TO ADVANCE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH ARE IN DIRECT FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hindu Samaj Mandal
18 Salisbury Street
Darlaston
WEDNESBURY
West Midlands
WS10 8BQ
- Phone:
- 07971 482 945
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window