KNOWLEDGE FOR GROWTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Policy advisement, Volunteer medical care , medical education,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- France
- Tanzania
Governance
- 25 April 2002: Standard registration
- KFG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Mariyam Hasham | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
AINE LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr AENGUS JOYCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £300 | £0 | £0 | £350 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £10 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 11TH DAY OF MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 29TH DAY OF MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE: THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF A HOSPITAL, MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO TANZANIA, AND PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY ESTABLISHING A HEALTH ADVISORY SERVICE IN TANZANIA FOR RELAYING INFORMATION AND ADVICE.
Area of benefit
AFRICA - TANZANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
520 Chiswick High Road
London
W4 5RG
- Phone:
- 02089878515
- Email:
- kfg.charity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window