L'ARCHE BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
L'Arche Benevolent Trust was established in May 2002 to help those L'Arche employees and former employees who, due to individual circumstances, need financial support. Areas in which financial support may be available include need due to permanent or temporary cessation of employment, ill health, repatriation, training and personal development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie Roberts | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Howard Leo Gilbert | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Mark Noel Kelly | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Celia Gurowich | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE POTTER | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.82k | £14.12k | £20.18k | £5.64k | £5.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.26k | £10.28k | £6.04k | £12.14k | £4.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28/02/2002 AS AMENDED ON 07/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL BURDENS EXPERIENCED BY THOSE EMPLOYEES OF L'ARCHE WHO MAY BE SUFFERING FROM PERSONAL OR HEALTH PROBLEMS WHETHER ARISING FROM A CONSEQUENCE OF EMPLOYMENT OR NOT WHICH CANNOT BE SATISFIED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
L'Arche
10 Briggate
Silsden
KEIGHLEY
BD20 9JT
- Phone:
- 01535656186
- Email:
- finance@larche.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window