GATEWAY NURSERIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nursery Education Provider.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 18 December 2001: Standard registration
- 13 December 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 13 December 2022: Funds transferred to 1101914 GATEWAY (EDUCATION & CHILDCARE) TRUST LIMITED
- GATEWAY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND CARE OF CHILDREN UNDER COMPULSORY SCHOOL RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF HEREFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A NURSERY FACILITY.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF HEREFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window