SHISHA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shisha is the international agency for contemporary South Asian crafts and visual arts. Shisha initiates partnerships to support artists' and makers' and curators' development, build audiences and enable other key organisations to promote and extend this work through a wide range of artistic initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 October 2001: Standard registration
- 23 July 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.05k | £257.75k | £230.73k | £256.65k | £222.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £278.54k | £253.41k | £224.88k | £267.17k | £356.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 08 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 08 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 08 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 08 December 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 21 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 09 December 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH APRIL
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF THE ARTS. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTS ORIGINATING FROM THE INDIAN SUB-CONTINENT THROUGH EXHIBITIONS, TRAINING, ADVOCACY AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window