Accounts and annual returns LITTLEHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1088906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 September 2024 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 March 2022 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 21 March 2022 629 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required